U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00510
  • Case Name: WALIA et al v. MICHAEL et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • May 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 06, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.