U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:79-cv-00271
  • Case Name: LUEVANO et al v. DIRECTOR, OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Bulk Records from Pre-CM/ECF- Records Use Only]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 12, 2025: [Vacate]
  • March 12, 2025: [Bulk Records from Pre-CM/ECF- Records Use Only]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.