U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03127
  • Case Name: MYERS et al v. NAPLES GOLF AND BEACH CLUB, INC. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 03, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • April 01, 2025: [Transfer Case]
  • April 01, 2025: [Errata]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • March 27, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 26, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
  • March 26, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 15, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 14, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 13, 2025: [Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA]
  • March 13, 2025: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • March 12, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.