U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01536
  • Case Name: HOLLEY v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 30, 2025: [USCA Order]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 12, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.