U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03192
  • Case Name: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION v. G BUILDERS LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 17, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 11, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 01, 2025: [Electronic Summons Reissued]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • March 28, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • March 28, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 28, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.