U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03272
  • Case Name: ZHANG v. KAO et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 03, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.