U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00542
  • Case Name: LEBLANC et al v. UNITED STATES PRIVACY AND CIVIL LIBERTIES OVERSIGHT BOARD et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 09, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 03, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Briefing Schedule]
  • March 12, 2025: [Expedite]
  • March 12, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.