U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03397
  • Case Name: AFSHAN v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Fox/Neal Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Foreign State or Agency]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.