U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03575
  • Case Name: AL-NOWAIRAH v. GARLAND et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Receipt and Acknowledgment of Transfer Papers]
  • May 02, 2025: [Case Transferred Out]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 22, 2025: [Transfer Case]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.