U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00080
  • Case Name: J. et al v. CIGNA HEALTH AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 06, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 03, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.