U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03530
  • Case Name: DOE v. UDC DAVID A. CLARKE SCHOOL OF LAW et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 07, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • May 06, 2025: [Status Report]
  • May 05, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • May 05, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • May 02, 2025: [Expedite]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • April 07, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 07, 2025: [Supplemental Memorandum]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 30, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 28, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 27, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 26, 2025: [Motion For Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Motion For Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • March 23, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 22, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • March 19, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 19, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 19, 2025: [Supplemental Memorandum]
  • March 18, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.