U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00466
  • Case Name: STRACCO v. COLLINS
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 03, 2025: [Pro Se Electronic Noticing Form]
  • April 03, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 03, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 03, 2025: [Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Motion For Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • March 21, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 21, 2025: [Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym]
  • March 16, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.