U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01613
  • Case Name: HEMSLEY v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 21, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 09, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 24, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • March 18, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.