U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-03548
  • Case Name: CHATTERJEE v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Response to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Fox/Neal Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Fox/Neal Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.