U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03455
  • Case Name: POWELL v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • May 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 12, 2025: [Modify]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Protective Order]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 16, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.