U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00329
  • Case Name: WINTU TRIBE OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA et al v. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • May 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • April 16, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Proposed Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Intervene]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 09, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • March 24, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 13, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 13, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 12, 2025: [Errata]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Error]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.