U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-02525
  • Case Name: DHAKAL v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Compel]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 17, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 08, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 08, 2025: [Strike]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 26, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 21, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 12, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 12, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.