U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00584
  • Case Name: WEATHERLY v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 20, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 18, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 12, 2025: [Waiver of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.