U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-02930
  • Case Name: ALUWALA v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 01, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Remark- Consolidation]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule]
  • March 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.