U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01014
  • Case Name: ADVANCE PUBLICATIONS, INC. et al v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 09, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 08, 2025: [Status Report]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 13, 2025: [Status Report Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.