U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00460
  • Case Name: GU v. TRUMP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • April 23, 2025: [Vacate]
  • April 23, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • April 23, 2025: [CM/ECF Password]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.