U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00556
  • Case Name: OROMO EVANGELICAL CHURCH OF WASHINGTON DC v. AVALON SETTLEMENTS, INC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • May 08, 2025: [Meet and Confer Statement]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • April 09, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 26, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.