U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03550
  • Case Name: NEHRING v. OCCASIONS CATERERS COMPASS GROUP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 07, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines]
  • May 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 06, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 02, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • May 01, 2025: [Mail Returned]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Consent to the filing of an Amended Complaint]
  • April 08, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • March 12, 2025: [Modify]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.