U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00074
  • Case Name: ALIGNMENT HEALTHCARE INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule]
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Administrative Record]
  • March 20, 2025: [Briefing Schedule]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.