U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00574
  • Case Name: CHU v. MAGIC LEAP, INC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2025: [Meet and Confer Statement]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.