U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00560
  • Case Name: NWOSU v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 20, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 20, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 19, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Errata]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.