U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00344-2
  • Case Name: USA v. HUNTER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Leave to File Review]
  • April 25, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 25, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 24, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.