U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00281
  • Case Name: SPENCER v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 02, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Fox/Neal Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.