U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01525
  • Case Name: AL OTRO LADO, INC. v. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • March 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.