U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03229
  • Case Name: SAADE v. PALLUCONI et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Stay]
  • May 12, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 28, 2025: [Status Report]
March, 2025
  • March 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 15, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.