U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03565
  • Case Name: YARBROUGH v. ALT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Strike]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Take Judicial Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • March 21, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 17, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • March 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.