U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03465
  • Case Name: PARK v. BREHMBHATT
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 07, 2025: [More Definite Statement]
  • May 06, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 03, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • April 02, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.