U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-02464
  • Case Name: PORTER v. KENNEDY, JR.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Mediation (Mediation Program)]
  • May 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 08, 2025: [Status Report]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • March 13, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.