U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00740
  • Case Name: CORPORATION FOR PUBLIC BROADCASTING v. FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • March 17, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 16, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 15, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 14, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 13, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 13, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • March 13, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • March 13, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 13, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 13, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.