U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00553
  • Case Name: SOUTHERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER v. UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 09, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.