U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03332
  • Case Name: ALLIANCE OF LEGAL CANNABIS ENTITIES-DC LLC v. POWER OF PLANTS LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 11, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Lift Stay]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Sever]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Lift Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.