U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03519
  • Case Name: FREEMAN II v. HARRIS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 15, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 03, 2025: [Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.