U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03254
  • Case Name: SHAFIQUE v. UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Response to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 15, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 14, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 13, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 03, 2025: [Supplemental Memorandum]
  • April 03, 2025: [Vacate]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Declaratory Judgment]
  • March 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Supplemental Memorandum]
  • March 28, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Errata]
  • March 28, 2025: [Motion For Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA]
  • March 19, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 14, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • March 13, 2025: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.