U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-03774
  • Case Name: HEKMATI v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Scheduling Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 27, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.