U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00737
  • Case Name: BUTTERBEE FARM v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • May 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 13, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 13, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 13, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 13, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 13, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 13, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.