U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00371
  • Case Name: SMITH et al v. PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Motion]
  • May 12, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • May 09, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 09, 2025: [Errata]
  • May 08, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • April 14, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 14, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 14, 2025: [Transfer Case]
  • April 14, 2025: [Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.