U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00749
  • Case Name: DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Status Report Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 23, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • March 23, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney]
  • March 23, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 17, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 17, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 14, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.