U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00606
  • Case Name: BREAD FOR THE CITY v. UNITED STATES SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • March 26, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney]
  • March 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • March 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 14, 2025: [Appear]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.