U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00661
  • Case Name: BREHMER v. SEE DC TODAY L.L.C et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Meet and Confer Statement]
  • May 01, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Status Report Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 23, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 21, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • April 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 14, 2025: [Entry of Default]
  • April 03, 2025: [Entry of Default]
  • April 03, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 03, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.