U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-02637
  • Case Name: THOMAS v. POWER et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 15, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 09, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 20, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.