U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03328
  • Case Name: ANI v. REAGAN
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Fox/Neal Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Transfer Case]
  • April 30, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 30, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Transfer Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • March 14, 2025: [Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.