U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00744
  • Case Name: CARTER et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 07, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Status Report]
  • May 05, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 02, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 09, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 17, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 14, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • March 14, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 14, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 14, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • March 14, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 14, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 14, 2025: [Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym]
  • March 14, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.