U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00760
  • Case Name: Doe, et al. v. COLLINS
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • May 02, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 18, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 18, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym]
  • April 09, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 14, 2025: [Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym]
  • March 14, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.