U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00641
  • Case Name: KAUL et al v. FEDERATION STATE MEDICAL BOARDS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 22, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 22, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 17, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 31, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • March 27, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 26, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons Reissued]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.