U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00759
  • Case Name: KHARIT et al v. RUBIO et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 06, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 03, 2025: [Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes]
March, 2025
  • March 22, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 22, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • March 22, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • March 17, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 17, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 14, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.